EP 1113154 A3 20031203 - Soot filter for diesel vehicles
Title (en)
Soot filter for diesel vehicles
Title (de)
Russfilter für Dieselfahrzeuge
Title (fr)
Filtre à suie pour véhicules diesel
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19963784 A 19991230
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1113154A2] The particle filter for a diesel engine has a housing containing a ceramic filter (1). A heater (9) is mounted on the housing and extends into a recess (12) in the front edge (7) of the filter which is first contacted by the gas stream, but is not in contact with it. An Independent claim is included for a similar filter in which the heater is contained in a collector for particles which is in contact with the filter.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F01N 3/021 (2006.01); F01N 3/022 (2006.01); F01N 3/027 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F01N 3/021 (2013.01); F01N 3/0222 (2013.01); F01N 3/027 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 4456457 A 19840626 - NOZAWA MASAEI [JP], et al
- [X] EP 0233860 A2 19870826 - VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT]
- [X] US 4523935 A 19850618 - TAKAGI SHIGERU [JP], et al
- [X] US 4872889 A 19891010 - LEPPERHOFF GERHARD [DE], et al
- [X] US 4662911 A 19870505 - HIRAYAMA TSUKASA [JP], et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 190 (M - 704) 3 June 1988 (1988-06-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 347 (M - 641) 13 November 1987 (1987-11-13)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 249 (M - 1604) 12 May 1994 (1994-05-12)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00128343 A 20001222