Global Patent Index - EP 1113442 A8

EP 1113442 A8 2001-12-12 - A method of menu-driven control of an external connected device in an audio/video apparatus

Title (en)

A method of menu-driven control of an external connected device in an audio/video apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur menü-gesteuerten Bedienung einer aüsseren Enrichtung, die an einem Audio/Videogerät angeschlossen ist

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande par menu d'un dispositif externe branché sur un appareil audio/video

Publication

EP 1113442 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00127929 A

Priority

KR 19990063019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1113442A2] The present invention relates to a method of menu-driven control of an external device connected to a digital audio/video apparatus. According to this invention, in response to user's request of a menu image for the external device, a menu image is displayed on a display of the digital audio/video apparatus, menu image including menu items associated with operations of the external device and menu items associated with the request of an image of the detailed menu of the external device. When a menu item for operations of the external device is selected, a command is transmitted to the external device to have the external device perform the desired operation. When a menu item associated with the request of the detailed menu image is chosen, the menu image is received from the external device and is then displayed on the display of the digital audio/video apparatus. This invention allows a user to conveniently, centrally examine and execute various operations or functions of external devices like DVD players that are connected to a central digital apparatus without the direct access to the external devices. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 27/10; G11B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0482 (2013.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G11B 19/02 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); G11B 31/00 (2006.01); G11B 33/10 (2006.01); H04L 12/40 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 5/765 (2006.01); H04N 5/775 (2006.01); H04N 5/93 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/40117 (2013.01); G11B 19/022 (2013.01); G11B 27/105 (2013.01); G11B 27/34 (2013.01); G11B 31/00 (2013.01); G11B 33/10 (2013.01); H04N 5/44513 (2013.01); H04N 5/775 (2013.01); H04N 21/4104 (2013.01); H04N 21/43632 (2013.01); H04N 21/485 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113442 A2 20010704; EP 1113442 A3 20020130; EP 1113442 A8 20011212; CN 100341319 C 20071003; CN 1304252 A 20010718; JP 2001238278 A 20010831; JP 2004007639 A 20040108; KR 100383843 B1 20030514; KR 20010060616 A 20010707; US 2001020958 A1 20010913

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090613

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060803

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 11B 27/10 A, 7G 11B 17/00 B, 7G 11B 19/02 B

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOO, JEA YONG

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIM, BYUNG JIN

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEO, KANG SOO

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIM, HYUNG SUN

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JO, NAM SEOK

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEO, SANG IL

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UM, SOUNG HYUN

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI