Global Patent Index - EP 1113702 A3

EP 1113702 A3 2002-12-18 - Acoustic dipole radiator for portable electronic devices

Title (en)

Acoustic dipole radiator for portable electronic devices

Title (de)

Akustischer Dipolsender für tragbare elektronische Geräte

Title (fr)

Radiateur acoustique à dipôle pour dispositifs électroniques portables

Publication

EP 1113702 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00310555 A

Priority

US 47604599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1113702A2] A wearable acoustic dipole radiator accessory for portable electronic devices such as mobile phones, portable cassette players, MP3 players, portable radios, or any other suitable device. The acoustic dipole radiator has two loudspeakers that are acoustically connected by an interconnection cavity. The loudspeakers do not need to contact the user's ears. The interconnection cavity limits mutual interference between the front and backwaves of the loudspeakers. In one embodiment, the acoustic dipole radiator is implemented in a necklace. In another embodiment, the acoustic dipole radiator is implemented in a helmet. In yet another embodiment, the acoustic dipole radiator is implemented in a headset in which the loudspeakers do not contact the ears. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/40; H04R 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113702 A2 20010704; EP 1113702 A3 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051123

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04R 1/40 A, 7H 04R 5/02 B

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI