Global Patent Index - EP 1114114 A4

EP 1114114 A4 2007-10-24 - HEAT TRANSFER FLUIDS

Title (en)

HEAT TRANSFER FLUIDS

Title (de)

WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

FLUIDES CALOPORTEURS

Publication

EP 1114114 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99942030 A

Priority

  • US 9917870 W
  • US 15674498 A
  • US 23143599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0015730A1] A heat transfer fluid having high heat capacity, high thermal loading capacity, low viscosity and low freezing point includes diphenyl oxide and 1,1 diphenyl ethane in broad proportions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0015730A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0015730 A1 20000323; AU 5549599 A 20000403; CA 2344276 A1 20000323; CA 2344276 C 20041019; EP 1114114 A1 20010711; EP 1114114 A4 20071024; MX PA01002760 A 20020424; TW 495546 B 20020721

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C09K 5/10 20060101AFI20101005BHEP

2008-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C09K 5/10 20060101AFI20080620BHEP

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-10-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070924

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI