Global Patent Index - EP 1114595 A3

EP 1114595 A3 2001-12-12 - Device for packaging with the sample that can be seen

Title (en)

Device for packaging with the sample that can be seen

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verpackung mit einem sichtbaren Muster

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement avec échantillon apparent

Publication

EP 1114595 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 01400019 A

Priority

FR 0000180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1114595A2] The cosmetic package has a sample enclosed in a transparent blister pack (11) heat-welded to the base (13) of the main package (1). Independent claims are included for: (a) a method for packaging a cosmetic using the package; and (b) the capsule containing the sample.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 33/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2013.01); A45D 40/16 (2013.01); A45D 2200/053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1114595 A2 20010711; EP 1114595 A3 20011212; FR 2803499 A1 20010713; FR 2803499 B1 20020531

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020304

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI