Global Patent Index - EP 1114681 A4

EP 1114681 A4 2003-06-11 - WORK ROLL FOR ROLLING DEVICE

Title (en)

WORK ROLL FOR ROLLING DEVICE

Title (de)

ARBEITSWALZE FÜR WALZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CYLINDRE DE TRAVAIL POUR DISPOSITIF DE LAMINAGE

Publication

EP 1114681 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99910749 A

Priority

  • JP 9901596 W
  • JP 8536998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1114681A1] A work roll for use in rolling apparatus for producing from a metal blank sheet articles having a deformed cross section and comprising, for example, a plate portion, and a plurality of upright walls formed on one surface of the plate portion integrally therewith and arranged as spaced apart from one another, such as flat heat exchange tube component members, heat sinks and lead frames. The work roll assures more simplified production work and provides surface finishes with higher accuracy than conventionally. The work roll comprises different kinds of disks having different diameters and arranged alternately on an axis into juxtaposed layers as secured to one another. Large disks 20A, 20B, are arranged at respective portions not forming the upright walls, and small disks 21A, 21B smaller than the large disks 20A, 20B in radius by an amount corresponding to the height of the upright walls are arranged at respective portions for forming the upright walls. Each of the disks 20A, 20B, 21A, 21B has an outer peripheral surface serving as a working surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 27/00; B21B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/00 (2006.01); B21B 27/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 3/00 (2006.01); B21B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/00 (2013.01); B21B 27/005 (2013.01); B21B 1/227 (2013.01); B21B 27/02 (2013.01); B21B 2003/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1114681 A1 20010711; EP 1114681 A4 20030611; EP 1114681 B1 20041215; AT 284764 T 20050115; CA 2326331 A1 19991007; CZ 20003569 A3 20010912; DE 69922671 D1 20050120; DE 69922671 T2 20051006; ES 2233026 T3 20050601; JP 4194241 B2 20081210; US 2002062674 A1 20020530; WO 9950003 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080329

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233026 T3

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922671 P 20050120

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-07-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLLING DEVICE

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 27/00 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 13/00 B

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHOWA DENKO K.K.

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000915

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE