Global Patent Index - EP 1114768 A3

EP 1114768 A3 2002-11-06 - SWATH vessel

Title (en)

SWATH vessel

Title (de)

SWATH-Schiff

Title (fr)

Bateau du type SWATH

Publication

EP 1114768 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01100297 A

Priority

DE 10000271 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1114768A2] The ship has a hull (10) with two separate supports (16,18) on its underside extending over at least part of the hull essentially in the direction of travel with at least part of at least one support ending on at the top on the hull side wall and its lower end attached to a buoyancy body (2,4) so that the buoyancy body lies inboard the plane of the side wall (10e,10f) or the external contour of the ship.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 1/12; B63B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 1232687 A 19710519
  • [DX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 155 (M - 090) 30 September 1981 (1981-09-30)
  • [DX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 202 (M - 405) 20 August 1985 (1985-08-20)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 189 (M - 099) 28 November 1981 (1981-11-28)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1114768 A2 20010711; EP 1114768 A3 20021106; DE 10000271 C1 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 1/12 A, 7B 63B 1/10 B

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI