Global Patent Index - EP 1115361 B1

EP 1115361 B1 2002-11-20 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A RECEPTACLE AND A CONTAINER AND READY-FOR-USE SET COMPRISING SAME

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A RECEPTACLE AND A CONTAINER AND READY-FOR-USE SET COMPRISING SAME

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZWISCHEN BEHÄLTER UND INHALT UND GEBRAUCHSFERTIGE ANORDUNGEN DIE EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ENTRE UN RECIPIENT ET UN CONTENANT ET ENSEMBLE PRET A L'EMPLOI COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1115361 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99946225 A

Priority

  • FR 9902268 W
  • FR 9812120 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783808A1] The invention concerns a connecting device (1) comprising a base (5) mounted on the receptacle (2) and extended by a flange (9) forming an inner bore (A) and a piston (10) capable of sliding in said inner bore (A) between a released position relative to a plug (4) and a transfer position wherein a hollow needle (11) borne by the piston (10) passes through the plug (4). A sealing lip (22) is arranged on an internal surface (8d) of the bore (A) opposite the piston (10) or on a surface of the piston, said lip (22) being shaped to be urged to press sealingly against the piston (10d) or against an internal surface of the bore, in the transfer position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 3/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/2089 (2013.01); A61J 1/201 (2015.05); A61J 1/2013 (2015.05); A61J 1/2051 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783808 A1 20000331; FR 2783808 B1 20001208; AT 227966 T 20021215; AU 5867199 A 20000410; AU 749364 B2 20020627; AU 749364 C 20030123; BR 9913901 A 20010703; CA 2339897 A1 20000330; CA 2339897 C 20080708; CN 1178638 C 20041208; CN 1314803 A 20010926; DE 69904064 D1 20030102; DE 69904064 T2 20031009; DK 1115361 T3 20030310; EP 1115361 A1 20010718; EP 1115361 B1 20021120; ES 2188238 T3 20030616; JP 2002526202 A 20020820; JP 3983978 B2 20070926; KR 100591213 B1 20060622; PT 1115361 E 20030228; RU 2214216 C2 20031020; TR 200101557 T2 20011022; US 6537263 B1 20030325; WO 0016730 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150924

2017-03-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170301

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904064

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110924

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090907

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BIODOME

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2004-12-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-09-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-09-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-09-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040923

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-19 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-18 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188238 T3

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400380

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904064 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227966 T 20021215

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020613

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI