Global Patent Index - EP 1115492 B1

EP 1115492 B1 2002-11-06 - VERTICAL ROTOR MILL

Title (en)

VERTICAL ROTOR MILL

Title (de)

VERTIKALROTORMÜHLE

Title (fr)

BROYEUR A ROTOR VERTICAL

Publication

EP 1115492 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942449 A

Priority

CH 9800408 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0018509A1] The invention relates to a vertical rotor mill, especially to an impact pulverizer or to a hammer mill for grinding granular material using impact tools (8). Said tools are fixed to a rotating, vertically arranged rotor (7) which is enclosed by a screen (9). The grinding chamber (19) is in turn enclosed by a conic housing (6). The aim of the invention is to simplify access to the screen (9) and to the impact tools (8), and to improve the operating characteristics. To this end, the cone (6) can be lowered together with the screen (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/14; B02C 13/284

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/14 (2006.01); B02C 13/284 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/14 (2013.01); B02C 13/284 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0018509 A1 20000406; AT 227165 T 20021115; AU 9060298 A 20000417; BR 9816025 A 20011023; CN 1098732 C 20030115; CN 1309588 A 20010822; CZ 20010158 A3 20010516; CZ 295602 B6 20050817; DE 59806224 D1 20021212; DK 1115492 T3 20030303; EA 002949 B1 20021226; EA 200100386 A1 20010827; EP 1115492 A1 20010718; EP 1115492 B1 20021106; ES 2183409 T3 20030316; HU 0103278 A2 20020128; HU 0103278 A3 20020429; HU 222862 B1 20031229; TR 200100807 T2 20020722; UA 63017 C2 20010917; US 6585178 B1 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080924

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080924

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080924

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUEHLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070806

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183409 T3

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806224 20021212

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. JOACHIM FROMMHOLD C/O. BUEHLER AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227165 T 20021115

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL