Global Patent Index - EP 1115673 B9

EP 1115673 B9 2002-12-11 - BONDED FIBROUS MATERIALS

Title (en)

BONDED FIBROUS MATERIALS

Title (de)

GEBUNDENES FASERMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX FIBREUX LIES

Publication

EP 1115673 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 99946364 A

Priority

  • GB 9903085 W
  • GB 9820124 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2341607A] A composite material comprises inorganic bonded alkaline earth silicate fibres in which any bonding agents or fillers comprise low amounts of Al such that the composite material comprises less than 1% by wt. Al expressed as Al<SB>2</SB>O<SB>3</SB>. alkaline earth silicate fibres are preferred for use in composites as they are soluble in body fluids and less likely to cause the respiratory problems characteristic of highly insoluble asbestos. However they are more reactive than asbestos and their performance at high temperatures is reduced. This is attributed to the presence of Al in associated binders and fillers. Thus by reducing the Al content the performance is enhanced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 28/24; C04B 30/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 14/46 (2006.01); C04B 28/24 (2006.01); C09K 21/02 (2006.01); C04B 111/20 (2006.01); C04B 111/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 28/24 (2013.01); C09K 21/02 (2013.01); C04B 2111/10 (2013.01); C04B 2111/34 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C04B 28/24 + C04B 14/4643 + C04B 40/0092 + C04B 2103/0091
  2. C04B 28/24 + C04B 14/4643 + C04B 24/2641 + C04B 40/0089
  3. C04B 28/24 + C04B 14/4643 + C04B 24/38 + C04B 40/0089

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2341607 A 20000322; GB 2341607 B 20000719; GB 9820124 D0 19981111; AT 216687 T 20020515; AU 5877699 A 20000403; AU 745860 B2 20020411; BR 9912237 A 20010410; CA 2336943 A1 20000323; CN 1318040 A 20011017; CZ 20010947 A3 20020417; DE 69901351 D1 20020529; DE 69901351 T2 20021128; DK 1115673 T3 20020812; EP 1115673 A1 20010718; EP 1115673 B1 20020424; EP 1115673 B9 20021211; ES 2178473 T3 20021216; HK 1024903 A1 20010713; ID 27963 A 20010503; JP 2002524385 A 20020806; MX PA01002621 A 20020408; PL 346609 A1 20020225; RU 2235696 C2 20040910; US 6987076 B1 20060117; WO 0015574 A1 20000323; ZA 200101621 B 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-21 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2007-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-05-02 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-05-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20061104

2006-10-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060907

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060903

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RATH GMBH

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RATH GMBH

- Effective date: 20030124

2005-05-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: THE MORGAN CRUCIBLE COMPANY PLC

2005-03-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THE MORGAN CRUCIBLE COMPANY PLC

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-10 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *MORGAN CRUCIBLE CY P.L.C.

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030914

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RATH GMBH

2003-04-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2003-04-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RATH GMBH

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178473 T3

2002-11-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-09-18 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020918

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-09-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020912

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901351 20020529

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216687 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI