Global Patent Index - EP 1115895 B1

EP 1115895 B1 2002-11-20 - METHOD FOR TREATING, BY NITRIDING, A SILICON SUBSTRATE FOR FORMING A THIN INSULATING LAYER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TREATING, BY NITRIDING, A SILICON SUBSTRATE FOR FORMING A THIN INSULATING LAYER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM NITRIEREN EINES SILIZIUM-SUBSTRATES ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ISOLATIONSBESCHICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT, PAR NITRURATION, D'UN SUBSTRAT DE SILICIUM POUR LA FORMATION D'UNE COUCHE ISOLANTE MINCE

Publication

EP 1115895 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99943005 A

Priority

  • FR 9902228 W
  • FR 9811746 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783530A1] Silicon substrate preparation for insulating thin film formation, comprises relatively low temperature treatment in a low pressure nitric oxide-based atmosphere. A silicon substrate is prepared for insulating thin film formation by deoxidation and then heat treatment at <= 750 deg C in an NO-based atmosphere at <= 5\*10<3> Pa pressure. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) a microelectronic device production process comprising formation of an insulating surface layer (24) on a silicon substrate (10) prepared by the above method; and (ii) a substrate comprising a silicon layer (10) having a native oxide-free area (12) in contact with a 0.5-1.5 nm thick silicon oxynitride layer (22) which is covered with a 2-5 nm thick insulating layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/28; C23C 28/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/28 (2006.01); C23C 28/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/044 (2013.01); C23C 8/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24926 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783530 A1 20000324; FR 2783530 B1 20010831; DE 69904069 D1 20030102; DE 69904069 T2 20030717; EP 1115895 A1 20010718; EP 1115895 B1 20021120; US 6551698 B1 20030422; WO 0017412 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904069

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120920

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120920

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120920

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1115895E

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904069 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE