Global Patent Index - EP 1116057 A4

EP 1116057 A4 2001-12-19 - LIQUID CORE WAVEGUIDE

Title (en)

LIQUID CORE WAVEGUIDE

Title (de)

WELLENLEITER MIT FLÜSSIGEM FASERKERN

Title (fr)

GUIDE D'ONDES A AME LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1116057 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99921551 A

Priority

  • US 9909395 W
  • US 8384398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9957584A1] A liquid core optical wave guide, particularly for long pathlengh absorbance spectroscopy. The liquid core waveguide has a relatively long pathlength and can be configured to fit within a relatively small space. The waveguide comprises a length of tubing (12) and a liquid core confined within the length of tubing (12), the tubing (12) having an index of refraction no less than the index of refraction of water, and the tubing (12) having a good flexibility. Preferably, the length of tubing (12) is several meters and a flexibility and structural integrity such that a cylindrical length of the tubing (12) having a liquid core diameter (d) of about 560 mu m, an outer diameter (D) of about 800 mu m, and a length of about 5 m can be coiled within a volume space of about 1.57 cubic inches, can support a body of aqueous medium over its length without crimping.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/85; G01N 21/75; G02B 6/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/03 (2006.01); G02B 6/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/032 (2013.01); G01N 21/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 0909946 A2 19990421 - WORLD PRECISION INSTR INC [US]
  • [X] ALTKORN R ET AL: "Low-loss liquid-core optical fiber for low-refractive-index liquids: fabrication, characterization, and application in Raman spectroscopy", APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 36, no. 34, 1 December 1997 (1997-12-01), pages 8992 - 8998, XP002180227
  • See also references of WO 9957584A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9957584 A1 19991111; AU 3873599 A 19991123; EP 1116057 A1 20010718; EP 1116057 A4 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2001-12-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 21/85 A, 7G 01N 21/75 B, 7G 02B 6/20 B

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE