Global Patent Index - EP 1116469 B1

EP 1116469 B1 2017-10-18 - Arrangement for toilet

Title (en)

Arrangement for toilet

Title (de)

Toilettenanlage

Title (fr)

Système pour toilettes

Publication

EP 1116469 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01100576 A

Priority

FI 20000041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1116469A1] Arrangement for a toilet (4) with an integrated load-bearing toilet bowl (5) comprising an upper support surface (6) intended for receiving a seat ring (7), or seat cover, which is releasably fastenable to fastening apertures (10) provided in connection with the upper support surface (6). The toilet (4) is provided with support handles (12,12a) releasably fastenable to the fastening apertures (10) below the upper support surface (6) on both sides of the toilet. In order to ensure an efficient and steady support function the support handles (12,12a) are part of a support handle unit comprising support members (11) and a connecting means (17). The support handles (12) and respective support members (11) of the support handle unit are connected to each other by the connecting means (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

LV

EPO simple patent family

EP 1116469 A1 20010718; EP 1116469 B1 20171018; DK 1116469 T3 20180102; FI 20000041 A0 20000110

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180119

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 937200 T

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-02-21 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-01-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20171219

2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60150645

2017-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 937200 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2017-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LV

2017-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-06-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170516

2016-06-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

2013-08-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1039737

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050401

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 20011228

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI