Global Patent Index - EP 1116470 B1

EP 1116470 B1 2002-12-04 - Suction nozzle for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Suction nozzle for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger

Title (fr)

Suceur pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1116470 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124872 A

Priority

DE 10000504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1116470A1] The suction head has a slide plate with a transverse suction opening, a suction channel with a hose connector, a vertically adjustable brush carrier and a vertically movable polishing plate. Elements for cleaning hard floors can be deployed by a control movement of the carrier. The polishing plate and brush carrier are mutually movable and the polishing plate can be deployed to polish smooth floors by a separate control movement. The suction head has an upper housing part (1) with a slide plate (2) with a transverse suction opening (3), a suction channel (4) with a hose connector(5), a brush carrier vertically adjustable on the upper housing part, a switch for operating the brush carrier and a polishing plate (7) vertically movable on the upper housing part. Elements for cleaning hard floors on the underside of the brush carrier can be deployed by a control movement of the brush carrier. The polishing plate and brush carrier are mutually relatively movable and the polishing plate can be deployed to polish smooth floors by a separate control movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0653 (2013.01); A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/0613 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1116470 A1 20010718; EP 1116470 B1 20021204; CN 1126498 C 20031105; CN 1303652 A 20010718; DE 10000504 A1 20010726; DE 10000504 C2 20021107; HK 1037116 A1 20040416

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000861 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI