Global Patent Index - EP 1116798 A9

EP 1116798 A9 2002-09-11 - HOT ROLLED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET EXCELLENT IN MAGNETIC CHARACTERISTICS AND CORROSION RESISTANCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

HOT ROLLED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET EXCELLENT IN MAGNETIC CHARACTERISTICS AND CORROSION RESISTANCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

HEISS GEWALZTES ELEKTROBLECH MIT HERVORRAGENDEN MAGNETISCHEN- UND KORROSIONSEIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

FEUILLE D'ACIER MAGNETIQUE LAMINEE A CHAUD PRESENTANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES MAGNETIQUES ET UNE RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION EXCELLENTES, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1116798 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00931586 A

Priority

  • JP 0003398 W
  • JP 14832599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1116798A1] A method for producing a hot-rolled electrical steel sheet excellent in magnetic characteristics and corrosion resistance, characterized in that the method comprises providing heating a super high purity iron having the composition: Fe: 99.95 mass % or more, C + N + S: 10 mass ppm or less, 0: 50 mass ppm or less, and balance: inevitable impurities, heating the iron to the gamma region thereof, carrying out a hot rolling at the gamma region under a condition wherein a total draft is 50 % or more and the friction coefficient between a roll and a rolled material is 0.3 or less at least in one pass, and then cooling the rooled iron under a condition wherein the average cooling speed in the range of Ar3 transformation point to 300 DEG C is 0.5 to 150 DEG C/min, thereby forming orientation grains having <100> axes integrated to the direction perpendicular to a sheet plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00; C21D 8/12; C21D 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 3/02 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C21D 8/1222 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1116798 A1 20010718; EP 1116798 A9 20020911; EP 1116798 B1 20050803; CA 2338775 A1 20001207; CA 2338775 C 20090908; DE 60021693 D1 20050908; DE 60021693 T2 20051229; JP 2000336464 A 20001205; JP 3706765 B2 20051019; KR 100413104 B1 20031231; US 6500278 B1 20021231; WO 0073524 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170526

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170526

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170527

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170526

2018-01-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021693

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60021693

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021693 P 20050908

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-11-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE