Global Patent Index - EP 1116841 B1

EP 1116841 B1 2003-06-04 - Lock, in particular mortise lock

Title (en)

Lock, in particular mortise lock

Title (de)

Schloss, insbesondere Einsteckschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure, notamment serrure encastrée

Publication

EP 1116841 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105837 A

Priority

  • DE 19636134 A
  • EP 97114579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828048A2] The lock (1) has a catch (13) lockable by a key. The key locking projection (29') or a key operated locking cylinder (29) engages in an engaging aperture (32) of a turning lever (25) in the casing above the keyhole. The free end of the turning lever acts with its free end sector in the catch locking direction on a catch operating pusher (22) which can be moved transversely to the direction of motion of the catch. This movement is transmitted indirectly to the catch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/08; E05B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 15/10 (2013.01); E05B 63/0021 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0493 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828048 A2 19980311; EP 0828048 A3 19980603; EP 0828048 B1 20020522; AT 217935 T 20020615; AT 242394 T 20030615; DE 19636134 A1 19980312; EP 1116841 A1 20010718; EP 1116841 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130822

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710243

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242394 T

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120807

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120817

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CARL *FUHR G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710243 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0828048 P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FUHR GMBH & CO.KG.

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-07-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 828048

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL