Global Patent Index - EP 1117864 B1

EP 1117864 B1 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR HIGH-SPEED FALSE TWIST TEXTURING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR HIGH-SPEED FALSE TWIST TEXTURING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSFALSCHDRAHTTEXTURIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TEXTURATION FAUSSE TORSION A GRANDE VITESSE

Publication

EP 1117864 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934703 A

Priority

  • DE 19833305 A
  • EP 9905018 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833305A1] The invention relates to a method for texturing yarns made of synthetic filaments, according to which a preparation containing at least a water-soluble lubricant (A) and a water-insoluble liquid (B) having a viscosity of between 2 and 50 mPas (20 DEG C, measured according to DIN 53015), and possibly emulsifiers and/or wetting agents and other additives is applied onto the yarn in the form of an aqueous emulsion, after which the filaments are subjected to texturing in accordance with the false twist principle on texturing machines having a short high-temperature heater.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 13/224; D02G 1/02; D06M 13/165; D06M 15/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/165 (2006.01); D06M 13/17 (2006.01); D06M 13/224 (2006.01); D06M 13/232 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/02 (2013.01); D02G 1/026 (2013.01); D06M 13/165 (2013.01); D06M 13/17 (2013.01); D06M 13/224 (2013.01); D06M 13/232 (2013.01); D06M 2200/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833305 A1 20000210; CN 1282791 C 20061101; CN 1310773 A 20010829; EP 1117864 A1 20010725; EP 1117864 B1 20030611; ES 2201744 T3 20040316; ID 27446 A 20010412; TR 200003812 T2 20010621; WO 0005447 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-15 [R27W] REVOKED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20030611

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20030611

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100211

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

- Free text: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG#HENKELSTRASSE 67#40589 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH#HENKELSTRASSE 67#40589 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2005-07-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SASOL GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAKO AG CHEMISCHE SPEZIALPRODUKTE

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201744 T3

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905947 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IE IT LI

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE