Global Patent Index - EP 1118303 A3

EP 1118303 A3 2002-12-11 - Method and device for dedusting the filter of a vacuum cleaner with partitioned filter chamber

Title (en)

Method and device for dedusting the filter of a vacuum cleaner with partitioned filter chamber

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Filterabreinigung eines Schmutzsaugers mit Filterkammerunterteilung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour nettoyer le filtre d'un aspirateur muni d'une chambre de filtration cloisonnée

Publication

EP 1118303 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00127429 A

Priority

DE 19961308 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1118303A2] The method involves using a chamber-type separation device and individual elastic seal elements (3) to divide a ring filter (2) of a filter unit into at least two areas. The filter unit has a casing with a hose connection on one side for air to be cleaned and a connection on the other side for additional air, which is supplied to clean the filter and controlled by controlling the air supply. The seal elements deform by changing volume, to divide the filter unit into an area to clean dirty air and an area to be cleaned by additional air. An Independent claim is included for a device for implementing the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1118303 A2 20010725; EP 1118303 A3 20021211; EP 1118303 B1 20051207; DE 19961308 A1 20010712; DE 50011813 D1 20060112; DK 1118303 T3 20060410

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-04-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011813 P 20060112

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI