Global Patent Index - EP 1118732 A3

EP 1118732 A3 2002-12-11 - Awning with articulated arms

Title (en)

Awning with articulated arms

Title (de)

Gelenkarm-Markise

Title (fr)

Store à bras articulés

Publication

EP 1118732 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115176 A

Priority

DE 10001754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1118732A2] The linkage arm awning has linkage arms (6) at a carrier tube (1), and the awning fabric extends between the awning extension tube (5) and the roll of fabric around the awning winding/unwinding shaft (3). When the awning extension pipe (5) is retracted, with the awning wound in, it is covered by a shrouding (9). The cross section of the shrouding is corrugated, ribbed or toothed, to form longitudinal grooves parallel to the carrier tube (1), and with lands on the outer surface of the shrouding which prevent rainwater dispersing inwards towards the building wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0618 (2013.01); E04F 10/0685 (2013.01); E04F 10/0666 (2013.01); E04F 10/0674 (2013.01); E04F 10/0696 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1118732 A2 20010725; EP 1118732 A3 20021211; EP 1118732 B1 20051221; DE 10001754 A1 20010719; ES 2253162 T3 20060601; JP 2001220872 A 20010817; US 2001008175 A1 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253162 T3

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011905 P 20060126

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI