Global Patent Index - EP 1118831 A3

EP 1118831 A3 2001-12-12 - Finned heat transfer wall

Title (en)

Finned heat transfer wall

Title (de)

Mit Rippenzug versehene Wärmetauscherwand

Title (fr)

Paroi ailetée pour échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1118831 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810953 A

Priority

DE 19963373 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1118831A2] The arrangement has at least one series of ribs (4) inducing turbulence in a medium flowing through the flow channel, attached to the side of the channel wall (3) facing the channel and whose main longitudinal direction is at a non-zero angle to the flow direction (7). The series of ribs has sections along at least part of its length whose axes (8) are at a non-zero angle to the main longitudinal direction of the series of ribs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/40 (2006.01); F28F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 13/12 (2013.01); F28F 1/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1118831 A2 20010725; EP 1118831 A3 20011212; EP 1118831 B1 20030924; DE 19963373 A1 20010712; US 6666262 B1 20031223

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50003825

2017-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003825

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2017-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170727 AND 20170802

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50003825

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50003825

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003825

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040104

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003825 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020508

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI