Global Patent Index - EP 1118983 A8

EP 1118983 A8 2001-12-05 - Optical disc, and reading system and manufacturing method of the disc

Title (en)

Optical disc, and reading system and manufacturing method of the disc

Title (de)

Optische Platte, Lesesystem und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Platte

Title (fr)

Disque optique, système de lecture et procédé de fabrication du disque

Publication

EP 1118983 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 01106060 A

Priority

  • EP 96110320 A
  • JP 15964595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751506A2] A writable optical disc has an information writing track (2), and a guiding track (3) for introducing a laser beam to the information writing track (2). The guiding track (3) has prepit information recorded thereon, the prepit information including at least address information of the optical disc (1). The prepit information (4) is recorded on the guiding track (3) at a position where interference of adjacent guiding tracks (3) with the prepit information is prevented. The information writing track (2) is a groove track, and the guiding track (3) is a land track. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/005 (2006.01); G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/09 (2006.01); G11B 7/13 (2012.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01); G11B 27/19 (2006.01); G11B 27/24 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/131 (2013.01); G11B 7/005 (2013.01); G11B 7/00745 (2013.01); G11B 7/0901 (2013.01); G11B 7/0903 (2013.01); G11B 7/0938 (2013.01); G11B 7/0943 (2013.01); G11B 7/261 (2013.01); G11B 7/263 (2013.01); G11B 27/19 (2013.01); G11B 27/24 (2013.01); G11B 27/3027 (2013.01); G11B 2220/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751506 A2 19970102; EP 0751506 A3 19980128; EP 0751506 B1 20010919; DE 69615291 D1 20011025; DE 69615291 T2 20020725; DE 69637764 D1 20090108; DE 69638027 D1 20091029; DE 69638052 D1 20091119; DE 69638272 D1 20101118; EP 1118981 A2 20010725; EP 1118981 A3 20050504; EP 1118981 B1 20090916; EP 1118982 A2 20010725; EP 1118982 A3 20050713; EP 1118982 B1 20091007; EP 1118983 A2 20010725; EP 1118983 A3 20010725; EP 1118983 A8 20011205; EP 1118983 B1 20081126; EP 1118983 B9 20090812; EP 1120782 A2 20010801; EP 1120782 A3 20050504; EP 1120782 B1 20101006; HK 1039204 A1 20090724; JP H0917029 A 19970117; US 2001000454 A1 20010426; US 2001000696 A1 20010503; US 2001000697 A1 20010503; US 2001000890 A1 20010510; US 6181657 B1 20010130; US 6310847 B2 20011030; US 6504814 B2 20030107; US 6630082 B2 20031007; US 7379399 B2 20080527

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160625

2016-07-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160625

2016-06-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69637764

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-05-12 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20100420

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-07-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1039204

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69637764 P 20090108

2008-11-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0751506 P

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KURODA, KAZUO

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUZUKI, TOSHIO

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MURAMATSU, EIJI

2008-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OPTICAL DISC

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060713

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION

2001-07-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 751506

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB