Global Patent Index - EP 1119288 A4

EP 1119288 A4 2003-06-11 - APPARATUS FOR RECOGNIZING TISSUE TYPES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR RECOGNIZING TISSUE TYPES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN VON GEWEBETYPEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE DE TYPES DE TISSUS

Publication

EP 1119288 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99953114 A

Priority

  • US 9923524 W
  • US 10350698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0019894A1] Electrodes (14) at the front of the tip (12) of the probe (11), are connected by wires (13) to control circuitry. The electrodes (14) can be used in pairs to measure the pulse response of tissue or as a group of four to perform four terminal conductivity measurements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/0538 (2013.01); A61B 5/0531 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0019894 A1 20000413; AU 6512399 A 20000426; EP 1119288 A1 20010801; EP 1119288 A4 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1039265

2006-06-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051214

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040713

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE