Global Patent Index - EP 1119426 B1

EP 1119426 B1 2002-11-20 - TOOL FOR PRODUCING A GEAR PART HAVING EXTERNAL TOOTHING

Title (en)

TOOL FOR PRODUCING A GEAR PART HAVING EXTERNAL TOOTHING

Title (de)

WERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AUSSEN VERZAHNTEN GETRIEBETEILES

Title (fr)

OUTIL UTILISE POUR PRODUIRE UNE PARTIE D'ENGRENAGE A DENTURE EXTERIEURE

Publication

EP 1119426 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914413 A

Priority

  • DE 9900387 W
  • DE 29817979 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0021699A1] The invention relates to a tool for producing a gear part having external toothing using a method of shaping by compression or by rolling. Said tool comprises a receiving tool (1) for supporting the work piece (3) which is impinged upon by a projection (2). Said receiving tool is driven to perform a rotational movement. The inventive tool additionally comprises a roller (4) which is mounted in a support in such a way that it can pivot about an axis (Y) that is parallel to the axis (X) of the receiving tool (1). Said roller can be adjusted in the direction of its Y axis in relation to the work piece (3). It is subdivided in the direction of its Y axis into several consecutive shaping areas with increasing tooth depths. The roller (4) can be applied to the work piece (3) in a perpendicular direction to its Y axis in order to carry out the compression method. The tooth height of the individual shaping areas increases while the tip circle remains the same across all shaping areas. The root radius of the individual shaping areas decreases and the tooth depth increases from one shaping area to the next shaping area. As a result, the tooth thickness at the root circle increases in all of the shaping areas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/00 (2006.01); B21D 53/28 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/02 (2013.01); B21D 53/28 (2013.01); B21K 1/30 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49471 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817979 U1 19990114; EP 1119426 A1 20010801; EP 1119426 B1 20021120; ES 2183537 T3 20030316; JP 2002527243 A 20020827; US 6470724 B1 20021029; WO 0021699 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-02-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-02-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183537 T3

2003-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903494 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT