Global Patent Index - EP 1119457 B1

EP 1119457 B1 2002-12-04 - GRAVURE PLATE AND GRAVURE PROCESS FOR FULL PRINTING OF LARGE SURFACES

Title (en)

GRAVURE PLATE AND GRAVURE PROCESS FOR FULL PRINTING OF LARGE SURFACES

Title (de)

STICHTIEFDRUCKPLATTE UND STICHTIEFDRUCKVERFAHREN ZUM VOLLFLÄCHIGEN BEDRUCKEN GROSSER FLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PLAQUE ET PROCEDE D'HELIOGRAVURE DESTINES A L'IMPRESSION COMPLETE DE GRANDES SURFACES

Publication

EP 1119457 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947434 A

Priority

  • DE 19845440 A
  • EP 9907217 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19845440A1] The invention relates to printing plates for full printing of large surfaces by means of a gravure process, a method for the production of said printing plates, and data carriers, especially banknotes with large-surface printed images that are produced according to a gravure process. In order to guarantee faultless inking, separating segments are provided in the engraving of the printing plate, whereby said separating segments protrude above the base surface of the engraving area in a perpendicular manner and are at least half as high as the depth of the engraving. The separating segments prevent, to a large extent, the printer's colour from being removed from the engraving surfaces when the printer's colour is wiped off from the surface of the printing plates. This makes it possible to provide full colour coatings for large areas. Special arrangement and special embodiment of the separating segments and the arrangement thereof enable the production of fine structures in the printing surface, whereby said fine structures can, according to the choice of distance between the separating segments, only be identified using auxiliary means of enlargement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/045; B41M 1/10; B41M 3/14; B41N 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2006.01); B41M 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41N 1/06 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/10 (2013.01); B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B41N 1/06 (2013.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 2033/18 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845440 A1 20000406; AR 020890 A1 20020605; AT 228932 T 20021215; AU 6088199 A 20000426; AU 755233 B2 20021205; CA 2345227 A1 20000413; CA 2345227 C 20070807; CN 1159152 C 20040728; CN 1316952 A 20011010; DK 1119457 T3 20030324; EP 1119457 A1 20010801; EP 1119457 B1 20021204; EP 1119457 B2 20140723; ES 2188246 T3 20030616; JP 2002526290 A 20020820; JP 2009214555 A 20090924; JP 4392779 B2 20100106; JP 5229964 B2 20130703; PL 190716 B1 20051230; PL 347154 A1 20020325; PT 1119457 E 20030331; RU 2230667 C2 20040620; TR 200100908 T2 20010821; US 2005056175 A1 20050317; US 6811858 B1 20041102; US 7350461 B2 20080401; WO 0020217 A1 20000413; ZA 200102253 B 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20180530

2018-01-31 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20171205

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE AND DEVRIENT GMBH, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59903682

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160929

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160929

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228932 T

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20141024

2014-11-26 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2014-11-04 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2014-08-28 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59903682

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-07-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2014-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2014-07-23 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59903682

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2014-05-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903682

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120929

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Effective date: 20030902

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20030902

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070920

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2009-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2009-06-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-05-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20030902

2009-05-04 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-04-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070920

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2003-10-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-09-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188246 T3

2003-05-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400580

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903682 20030116

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010502;LT PAYMENT 20010502;LV PAYMENT 20010502;MK PAYMENT 20010502;RO PAYMENT 20010502;SI PAYMENT 20010502

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228932 T 20021215

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41C 1/045 A, 7B 41M 1/10 B, 7B 41M 3/14 B, 7B 41N 1/06 B

2001-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GRAVURE PLATE AND GRAVURE PROCESS FOR FULL PRINTING OF LARGE SURFACES

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010502;LT PAYMENT 20010502;LV PAYMENT 20010502;MK PAYMENT 20010502;RO PAYMENT 20010502;SI PAYMENT 20010502