Global Patent Index - EP 1119710 B1

EP 1119710 B1 2002-09-04 - FRICTION VACUUM PUMP

Title (en)

FRICTION VACUUM PUMP

Title (de)

REIBUNGSVAKUUMPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE A FRICTION

Publication

EP 1119710 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938360 A

Priority

  • DE 19846189 A
  • EP 9905395 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19846189A1] The invention relates to a friction vacuum pump which is provided with a stator unit (9), a rotor unit (12) and a housing (2, 7). During operation of said pump, a narrow gap should be maintained between the stator and rotor. In order to maintain the narrow gaps, the invention provides that the stator (9) and rotor (8) are coupled to each other in such a manner that they practically perform identical oscillations. In addition, the system (3) consisting of the stator unit (9) and the rotor unit (8) is held in the housing (2, 7) by means of the oscillating elements (4, 5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/66; F04D 17/16; F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2013.01); F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 19/044 (2013.01); F04D 29/668 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19846189 A1 20000413; EP 1119710 A1 20010801; EP 1119710 B1 20020904; JP 2002526721 A 20020820; US 6641376 B1 20031104; WO 0020763 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902592

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100728

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1119710E

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902592 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010303

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE