Global Patent Index - EP 1120059 A3

EP 1120059 A3 2002-11-06 - Mascara brush

Title (en)

Mascara brush

Title (de)

Mascara-Bürstchen

Title (fr)

Brosse à mascara

Publication

EP 1120059 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101206 A

Priority

DE 10003858 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001010227A1] In a mascara brush comprising a multiplicity of bristles fixed between two helically twisted wire segments, with bristles or tufts of bristles with varying radial lengths extending from the wire core formed by the helically twisted wires, provision is made for the tips of tie shorter bristles to be located essentially on a nearly rotation-symmetrical, especially cylindrical, inner envelope.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/02; A45D 40/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/18 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/021 (2013.01); A45D 40/267 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1120059 A2 20010801; EP 1120059 A3 20021106; EP 1120059 B1 20050713; CN 1141897 C 20040317; CN 1308910 A 20010822; DE 10003858 A1 20010802; ES 2244503 T3 20051216; JP 2001224432 A 20010821; US 2001010227 A1 20010802

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110225

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100119

2011-03-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-12-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244503 T3

2005-09-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050815

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106709 P 20050818

2005-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 46B 9/02 A, 7A 45D 40/26 B

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEKA BRUSH GMBH

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI