Global Patent Index - EP 1120252 A3

EP 1120252 A3 2002-09-18 - Flushing device for a gumming station in a unit for washing, gumming and drying printing plates

Title (en)

Flushing device for a gumming station in a unit for washing, gumming and drying printing plates

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Spülen einer Gummierstation in einer Anlage zum Waschen, Gummieren und Trocknen von Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rinçage d'une station d'engommage dans une ensemble de lavage, d'engommage et de séchage de plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 1120252 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101864 A

Priority

DE 20001524 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120252A2] In the gumming station (5), there is a pair of rollers (10,11) above one another rotating about horizontal axes. The printing plates pass through a gap between them. Nozzles on the upper rollers are supplied either with gum or with an aqueous washing solution from storage tanks fitted with level control devices. The liquids which run off are collected separately in troughs (7-8) under the bottom roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/001 (2013.01); B41P 2235/22 (2013.01); B41P 2235/26 (2013.01); B41P 2235/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20001524 U1 20000504; EP 1120252 A2 20010801; EP 1120252 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI