Global Patent Index - EP 1120262 A4

EP 1120262 A4 20020116 - ROTARY PRINTER

Title (en)

ROTARY PRINTER

Title (de)

ROTATIONSDRUCKER

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 1120262 A4 20020116 (EN)

Application

EP 99940461 A 19990825

Priority

  • JP 9904569 W 19990825
  • JP 28834798 A 19981009
  • JP 28834898 A 19981009

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120262A1] A rotary printing apparatus includes a thermal head 11 for thermally printing in a main scanning direction along a radial direction of a disk print medium M having a heat-sensitive coloring layer, a spring 11a for pressing the thermal head 11 against the disk print medium M, a turn table 19 for supporting the disk print medium M rotatably in a sub-scanning direction along a circumferential direction of the disk print medium M, and a pinch roller 31 for rotation-driving the disk print medium M by contacting an outer circumferential portion thereof. With this construction, high quality image printing can be achieved by driving the disk print medium to rotate stably during printing operations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7

B41J 2/32; B41J 3/407; G11B 23/40

IPC 8 full level

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

B41J 2/32 (2013.01); B41J 3/407 (2013.01); B41J 2202/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] GB 2320912 A 19980708 - EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]
  • [A] US 5045523 A 19910903 - FUNAE HARUYOSHI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 03 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 243 (M - 1602) 10 May 1994 (1994-05-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 02 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 694 (M - 1531) 17 December 1993 (1993-12-17)
  • See also references of WO 0021757A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1120262 A1 20010801; EP 1120262 A4 20020116; WO 0021757 A1 20000420

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 99940461 A 19990825; JP 9904569 W 19990825