Global Patent Index - EP 1120346 A3

EP 1120346 A3 2002-09-04 - Device and procedure for packing a mattress filling

Title (en)

Device and procedure for packing a mattress filling

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verpacken einer Matratzenfüllung

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour emballer un remplissage de matelas

Publication

EP 1120346 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01200041 A

Priority

IT MI20000018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120346A2] A device (11) for packing a mattress filling (12) comprising a box-type L-shaped body (52) with prismatic section featuring successive interconnected compression chamber (54) and expulsion chamber (56) inside which two pistons (64, 66) slide in succession. The body (52) is provided with a first aperture (58) via which a first piston (64) can be inserted inside to press a filling (12) in the final part of the first chamber (54) until it is aligned with the second chamber (56), in the middle of the body (52). A second aperture (60) is provided for the insertion of a second piston (66) to expel the compressed filling towards an outlet (62) where a rigid container (70) is positioned. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 63/02; A47C 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 63/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] US 4094130 A 19780613 - KELLY NORMAN, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1120346 A2 20010801; EP 1120346 A3 20020904; IT 1316166 B1 20030403; IT MI20000018 A1 20010711; IT MI20000018 D0 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI