Global Patent Index - EP 1120372 A3

EP 1120372 A3 2002-11-06 - Hand held ahesive tape dispenser with multiple hinge

Title (en)

Hand held ahesive tape dispenser with multiple hinge

Title (de)

Klebeband-Handabroller mit Mehrfachscharnier

Title (fr)

Distributeur de ruban adhésif portable à charnière multiple

Publication

EP 1120372 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101763 A

Priority

DE 10003753 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120372A2] The adhesive tape dispenser consists of a top shell (2), bottom shell (3) and reel holder (4). All of these are connected to a hinge (5) whose axis is parallel to that of the reel. When the dispenser is closed, a slot for withdrawing tape is formed between the two shells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0026 (2013.01); B65H 2402/5161 (2013.01); B65H 2601/321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1120372 A2 20010801; EP 1120372 A3 20021106; EP 1120372 B1 20050413; DE 10003753 A1 20010809; ES 2239072 T3 20050916

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50105868

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50105868

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110127

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110126

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239072 T3

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105868 P 20050519

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEIBER, JOERN DR.

2004-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WOLF, THEODOR

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI