Global Patent Index - EP 1120512 A3

EP 1120512 A3 2002-11-13 - Staircase

Title (en)

Staircase

Title (de)

Treppe

Title (fr)

Escalier

Publication

EP 1120512 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101765 A

Priority

DE 20001559 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120512A2] The stairs with at least one support member (7) and several treads (with each of the treads incorporating a tread plate which rests on a bearing surface of the support member) is characterized by the fact that the support member consists of natural or artificial stone. In between the bearing surfaces and the tread plates an elastic bearing element is arranged, which preferably consists of ebonite/vulcanite, polyvinyl chloride or both.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/00 (2006.01); E04F 11/025 (2006.01); E04F 11/116 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/116 (2013.01); E04F 11/025 (2013.01); E04F 11/035 (2013.01); E04F 2011/0209 (2013.01); E04F 2011/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20001559 U1 20000427; EP 1120512 A2 20010801; EP 1120512 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI