Global Patent Index - EP 1120548 A3

EP 1120548 A3 2001-12-05 - Engine valve drive with electromagnetic actuators comprising pneumatic return springs

Title (en)

Engine valve drive with electromagnetic actuators comprising pneumatic return springs

Title (de)

Ventilsteuerung für Brennkraftmaschinen mit einem mit Gasfedern ausgerüsteten elektro-magnetischen Aktor

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape de moteur à combustion interne par actionneur électromagnétique muni de ressorts de rappel pneumatiques

Publication

EP 1120548 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00126373 A

Priority

DE 10003116 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120548A2] The valve control (1) has an electromagnetic actuator (2) provided with gas springs (3,4), with an armature (6) coupled to the engine gas changing valve (5) provided by a separation piston (13) between the gas springs, displaced within a cylinder (12) between a closure magnet (7) and an opening magnet (8) against the return force of the gas springs. The latter have gas entry and exit valves (10,11) controlled in dependence on the engine load range for altering the spring characteristic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1120548 A2 20010801; EP 1120548 A3 20011205; EP 1120548 B1 20050727; DE 10003116 A1 20010802; ES 2242574 T3 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242574 T3

2005-11-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010827 P 20050901

2005-08-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI