Global Patent Index - EP 1120572 A3

EP 1120572 A3 2002-09-18 - Centrifugal pump

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifuge

Publication

EP 1120572 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00121080 A

Priority

DE 10003644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10003644C1] The circulation pump has a 2-part pump housing (2) of injection moulded plastics, the first housing part (3) having an axial suction connection and a tangential pressure connection (6) and provided with a sealing edge cooperating with the second housing part (4) containing the electric pump motor. The pump housing encloses a cylindrical pump space with a spiral internal contour (20), provided with a pump wheel (8) driven by the electric motor. A rounded spur (12) projecting into the pump space is formed integral with the second housing part for providing a smooth transition between the internal wall of the pump space and the pressure connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/428 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10003644 C1 20010510; EP 1120572 A2 20010801; EP 1120572 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040904

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI