Global Patent Index - EP 1120757 A3

EP 1120757 A3 2002-09-04 - Gaming terminal and system with biometric identification

Title (en)

Gaming terminal and system with biometric identification

Title (de)

Spielsystem und Terminal mit biometrischer Identifizierung

Title (fr)

Système et terminal de jeu avec identification biométrique

Publication

EP 1120757 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01101836 A

Priority

  • CA 2331976 A
  • US 49189900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1120757A2] A gaming system is provided with biometric facilities for identifying or verifying the identity of a player or perspective player. In one aspect reference biometric data is stored in a portable biometric data storage device such as a smart card, PCMCIA card or the like and is preferably left in the possession or control of the individual or individuals to whom the biometric data relates. The reference biometric data is read in individual gaming terminals and compared, in individual gaming terminals to measured biometric data of a player or perspective player. In one aspect, gaming terminals use biometric verification or indication to implement a practical and feasible cashless gaming terminal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3206 (2013.01); G07C 9/00087 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3227 (2013.01); G07F 17/3251 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1120757 A2 20010801; EP 1120757 A3 20020904; CA 2331976 A1 20020719; CA 2331976 C 20100601

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI