EP 1120889 A3 20020123 - Vibration motor having an eccentric weight and device including the same motor
Title (en)
Vibration motor having an eccentric weight and device including the same motor
Title (de)
Schwingungsmotor mit Exzentergewicht und Gerät diesen Motor beinhaltend
Title (fr)
Moteur à vibration avec un lestage excentrique et appareil incorporant un tel moteur
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 2000019819 A 20000128
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1120889A2] A motor includes a stator and a rotor facing the stator. The rotor has a magnet and an eccentric weight. The magnet is magnetized in a rotational direction and produces driving magnetic field. The eccentric weight is made of the material having a greater specific gravity than the magnet. The magnet shapes in a cylinder and a part of the cylinder is cut away to form a space. The eccentric weight is placed in the space. A rotational area of the magnet and that of the eccentric weight overlap each other. In this structure, rotation of the rotor spins the eccentric weight, thereby producing large vibrations. The eccentric weight is accommodated by a motor housing for the safety. The thin and compact motor is thus obtainable. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B06B 1/04 (2006.01); B06B 1/16 (2006.01); H02K 7/06 (2006.01); H02K 7/075 (2006.01); H02K 7/08 (2006.01); H02K 21/22 (2006.01); H02K 1/27 (2006.01); H02K 1/28 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H02K 7/063 (2013.01 - EP US); H02K 7/086 (2013.01 - EP US); H02K 1/274 (2013.01 - EP US); H02K 1/28 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [PX] EP 1016467 A2 20000705 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
- [XA] US 4864276 A 19890905 - TRIBBEY DAVID A [US], et al
- [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 12 3 January 2001 (2001-01-03)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 3 30 March 2000 (2000-03-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 9 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 8 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1120889 A2 20010801; EP 1120889 A3 20020123; EP 1120889 B1 20090527; CN 1218457 C 20050907; CN 1309453 A 20010822; JP 2001205191 A 20010731; JP 3159212 B1 20010423; US 2002047369 A1 20020425; US 6479914 B2 20021112
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01101816 A 20010126; CN 01103040 A 20010118; JP 2000019819 A 20000128; US 77069801 A 20010126