Global Patent Index - EP 1121298 B1

EP 1121298 B1 2002-11-13 - COMPOSITE BOTTLE FORMED FROM A CONTAINER AND A NECK SEALEDLY MOUNTED ON THE CONTAINER MOUTH

Title (en)

COMPOSITE BOTTLE FORMED FROM A CONTAINER AND A NECK SEALEDLY MOUNTED ON THE CONTAINER MOUTH

Title (de)

AUS EINEM BEHÄLTER UND EINEM HALS HERGESTELLTE MEHRTEILIGE FLASCHE, DEREN HALS AUF DER BEHÄLTERMÜNDUNG DICHTEND BEFESTIGT IST

Title (fr)

BOUTEILLE COMPOSITE FORMEE AVEC UN RECIPIENT ET UN GOULOT MONTE DE MANIERE ETANCHE SUR L'OUVERTURE DU RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 1121298 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920791 A

Priority

  • EP 9902825 W
  • IT MI982215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0021843A1] A composite bottle comprising a container (B) and a neck (A) which are produced separately by moulding plastics material and are mechanically coupled one on the other in a sealed manner, necks of different shapes and dimensions being able to be mounted on the mouth of identical containers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02; B65D 8/04; B65D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 8/02 (2006.01); B65D 8/04 (2006.01); B65D 23/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B65D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 11/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0021843 A1 20000420; AU 3823799 A 20000501; DE 69903968 D1 20021219; DE 69903968 T2 20030327; EP 1121298 A1 20010808; EP 1121298 B1 20021113; ES 2188163 T3 20030616; IT 1302676 B1 20000929; IT MI982215 A1 20000415; IT MI982215 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070427

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060428

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2005-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188163 T3

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903968 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT