Global Patent Index - EP 1121509 B1

EP 1121509 B1 2003-06-18 - STEAM TURBINE WITH AN EXHAUST STEAM HOUSING

Title (en)

STEAM TURBINE WITH AN EXHAUST STEAM HOUSING

Title (de)

DAMPFTURBINE MIT EINEM ABDAMPFGEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

TURBINE A VAPEUR COMPORTANT UN BOITIER DE VAPEUR D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 1121509 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955798 A

Priority

  • DE 9903080 W
  • DE 19846224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19846224A1] The invention relates to a steam turbine (1) with an exhaust steam housing (2). The aim of the invention is to provide a particularly simple means of enabling an exhaust steam housing to be adapted to different combinations of an entry housing (26), which is connected upstream of the exhaust steam housing (2), and a condenser, whilst guaranteeing good flow conditions for the exhaust steam. To this end, the outer jacket (34) of the exhaust steam housing (2) comprises a first jacket part (36) in the form of a cylindrical jacket which is connected by a stiffening ring (38) to a second jacket part (40) in the form of a conical jacket. A conical jacket-shaped guiding element (44) for guiding the flow of exhaust steam inside the outer jacket (34) is located on the stiffening ring (38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2013.01); F05D 2230/61 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19846224 A1 20000420; EP 1121509 A1 20010808; EP 1121509 B1 20030618; US 2001031200 A1 20011018; US 6406252 B2 20020618; WO 0020727 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100925

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906036

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090908

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906036 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE