Global Patent Index - EP 1122028 A3

EP 1122028 A3 2001-12-12 - Grinding of clothing

Title (en)

Grinding of clothing

Title (de)

Schleifen von Garnituren

Title (fr)

Meulage de garnitures

Publication

EP 1122028 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01109270 A

Priority

  • CH 93396 A
  • EP 97810178 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0800895A1] The carding instrument (1) has fibre material fed into a filling shaft (2) in the form of dispersed and cleaned flocks, where it is taken over by a breaker or tearer. It is then fed to a drum (4) and is dispersed and cleaned by a shift cover unit (5). Fibres are then taken from the fleece located on the drum by a pick-up (7) and are formed into a carding strip (9) in an outlet part (8) consisting of several rollers. The grinding or card sharpening apparatus has a number of individual grinding components which penetrate into the points of the fitting to be ground, extending over the head parts of the points and grinding them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2006.01); D01G 15/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/84 (2013.01); B24B 19/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0800895 A1 19971015; EP 0800895 B1 20020529; DE 59707351 D1 20020704; EP 1122028 A2 20010808; EP 1122028 A3 20011212; US 6129614 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20071002

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030905

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020525

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2001-08-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 800895

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI