EP 1122030 A3 20031210 - Abrasive tool
Title (en)
Abrasive tool
Title (de)
Schleifwerkzeug
Title (fr)
Outil abrasif
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 2000029614 A 20000207
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1500469A1] An abrasive tool (420) with metal binder phase has plural protruded parts formed in base metal (422), and has abrasive grain layer (424) with small abrasive-grain-layer parts (428) set at an interval mutually and ultra abrasive grains (14,414) are adhered at these protruded parts by metal binder phase. A single ultra abrasive grain is adhered at each of said small abrasive-grain-layer parts by the metal binder phase. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B24B 53/12 (2006.01); B24D 3/00 (2006.01); B24D 3/06 (2006.01); B24D 7/06 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
B24B 53/017 (2013.01 - EP); B24B 53/12 (2013.01 - EP); B24D 3/06 (2013.01 - EP KR); B24D 7/06 (2013.01 - EP); B24D 18/0018 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5989405 A 19991123 - MURATA YASUNORI [JP], et al
- [X] US 6001008 A 19991214 - FUJIMORI KEIICHI [JP], et al
- [X] US 6004196 A 19991221 - DOAN TRUNG T [US], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 08 30 June 1999 (1999-06-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 396 (M - 1644) 25 July 1994 (1994-07-25)
- [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 05 30 May 1997 (1997-05-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1122030 A2 20010808; EP 1122030 A3 20031210; EP 1122030 B1 20060628; AT E331591 T1 20060715; DE 60121070 D1 20060810; DE 60121070 T2 20070606; EP 1500469 A1 20050126; HK 1039296 A1 20020419; JP 2001219376 A 20010814; KR 100749385 B1 20070814; KR 20010078363 A 20010820
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01101689 A 20010130; AT 01101689 T 20010130; DE 60121070 T 20010130; EP 04024424 A 20010130; HK 02100678 A 20020129; JP 2000029614 A 20000207; KR 20010005927 A 20010207