Global Patent Index - EP 1122170 B1

EP 1122170 B1 2002-11-27 - Sterile tunnel for aseptically operating packaging machines

Title (en)

Sterile tunnel for aseptically operating packaging machines

Title (de)

Steriltunnel für aseptisch arbeitende Verpackungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Tunnel stérile pour des machines d'emballage au fonctionnement aseptique

Publication

EP 1122170 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01100234 A

Priority

DE 10004076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10004076C1] The sterile tunnel (1) contains working elements connected to external drives (2) via adjusting rods (3) passing through a telescopic tube seal unit. The upper telescopic tube (6) has an upper closed section (7) with evenly distributed drain openings (8) to permit flow of a sterilization medium out of the tunnel. The openings are located in a flange (9) or a carrier plate (10) on the upper section. The top end of the upper telescopic tube is sealed by a plate, which is connected to the drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10004076 C1 20010621; EP 1122170 A1 20010808; EP 1122170 B1 20021127; ES 2183800 T3 20030401; US 2001010805 A1 20010802; US 6495111 B2 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050104

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-02-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050201

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-01-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-01-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-01-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183800 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100061 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI