Global Patent Index - EP 1122292 B1

EP 1122292 B1 2003-06-18 - Liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal display device

Title (en)

Liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal display device

Title (de)

Flüssigkristallzusammensetzung und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Composition liquide cristalline et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 1122292 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01102169 A

Priority

  • JP 2000027959 A
  • JP 2000160243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1122292A2] The present invention is to provide a liquid crystal composition which has particularly a high upper limit temperature of a nematic phase, a low lower limit temperature of the nematic phase and a small birefringence while satisfying general characteristics required to the liquid crystal composition for an AM-LCD. Liquid crystal compositions are disclosed which comprising a component I comprising at least one compound selected from the group of compounds represented by Formula (I-1) or (I-2), a component II comprising at least one compound selected from the group of compounds represented by Formulas (II-1) to (II-8) and a component III comprising at least one compound selected from the group of compounds represented by Formulas (III-1) to (III-5): <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> <CHEM> wherein R<1> and R<2> each represent independently an alkyl group, an alkoxy group, an alkoxymethyl group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms or an alkenyl group having 2 to 10 carbon atoms; R<3> represents an alkyl group, an alkoxy group, an alkoxymethyl group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms, an alkenyl group having 2 to 10 carbon atoms or -COO-R<6>; R<6> represents an alkyl group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms; R<4> represents an alkyl group, an alkoxy group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms or an alkenyl group having 2 to 10 carbon atoms; R<5> represents an alkyl group, an alkoxy group, an alkoxymethyl group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms or an alkenyl group having 2 to 10 carbon atoms; Z<1> and Z<4> each represent independently a single bond or -CH2CH2-; Z<2> and Z<3> each represent independently a single bond, -CH2CH2- or -CH=CH-; X1 represents F, Cl, OCHF2 or OCF3; X2 represents F, OCHF2 or OCF3; Y<1> and Y<2> each represent independently H or F; and Q represents H or F.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 19/30; C09K 19/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/13 (2006.01); C09K 19/30 (2006.01); C09K 19/34 (2006.01); C09K 19/42 (2006.01); C09K 19/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 19/42 (2013.01); C09K 19/3001 (2013.01); Y10T 428/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1122292 A2 20010808; EP 1122292 A3 20011107; EP 1122292 B1 20030618; DE 60100368 D1 20030724; DE 60100368 T2 20040429; JP 2001288470 A 20011016; JP 3601415 B2 20041215; US 2002066887 A1 20020606; US 6572938 B2 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., JNC CORPORATION, , JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHISSO CORP., CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., , JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHISSO CORP., CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., , JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., JNC CORPORATION, , JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: CHISSO CORP., OSAKA, JP; CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP; JNC CORPORATION, TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: CHISSO CORP., OSAKA, JP; CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: CHISSO PETROCHEMICAL CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP; JNC CORPORATION, TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60100368

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60100368

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60100368

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60100368

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60100368

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-01-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60100368

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2005-09-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-07-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60100368 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020208

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI