Global Patent Index - EP 1122348 B1

EP 1122348 B1 2004-12-01 - Driving device for the blade-holder carriage in a double plush loom

Title (en)

Driving device for the blade-holder carriage in a double plush loom

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für den Messerschlitten einer Doppelflorwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour le chariot porte-lame d'un métier à tisser double peluche

Publication

EP 1122348 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01101791 A

Priority

DE 10004904 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10004904C1] The drive for the cutter blade slide, to sever the pile yarns between two layers of woven pile carpet fabrics, has a reversible servo motor at the double-pile loom controlled by a preset program. The system also has a path meter, and a transmitter to register the actual path movement units, and at least one transmission to move the slide along a guide rail. An inelastic transmission with a positive fit is between the cutting blade slide (3) and the monitor system (411,412), as a toothed belt (42,45), a spindle and nut or a coupling. The transmitter/path movement monitor (411,412) is at the servo motor (41), which is secured to a frame. The servo motor (41) drives at least one toothed belt (42,45). The cutting blade slide (3) is mounted to one level of a belt (45) with a positive fit. The continuous toothed belt (45) passes around two belt disks (43), each fitted with a synchronized servo motor (41). The drive transmission can be through a spindle, aligned parallel to the slide guide rail (2). A nut is moved along the spindle by its rotation, with a positive fit at the slide (3) for its movements. The servo motor can be a linear motor, with its stator as a component part of the slide guide rail (2), and the rotor is connected to the slide (3). The path movement monitor is at the guide rail (2), and the transmitter is at the rotor. A sensor (26) is at the blade slide (3) in a given position, to register the blade projection. A system is at a second given position to release the blade temporarily from the slide (3), using a limit stop (25) and a press lever (24). A pressure bolt moves the detached blade in relation to the slide (3) into a set cutting position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 39/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 39/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 39/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10004904 C1 20010510; EP 1122348 A1 20010808; EP 1122348 B1 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104640 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI