Global Patent Index - EP 1122379 A3

EP 1122379 A3 2002-11-13 - Curved staircase and stair tread for curved staircase

Title (en)

Curved staircase and stair tread for curved staircase

Title (de)

Drehtreppe und Treppenstufe für Drehtreppe

Title (fr)

Escalier tournant et marche d'escalier pour escalier tournant

Publication

EP 1122379 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01301080 A

Priority

JP 2000028572 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1122379A2] A curved staircase (1) and a stair tread (4,5,6,7) for a curved staircase (1) capable of reducing a stock space used for stock keeping, enhancing the working efficiency for shipment without requiring a selection operation in accordance with a curve direction of a curved staircase (1), and facilitating assembly at a building site is provided. A curved staircase A (1) is formed by asymmetrical stair treads (4,5,6 and 7) such that finishing process for enabling use as a treadboard is applied to one horizontal surface of each stair tread (4,5,6,7), which can be an upper surface when arranged in a curved portion (10) bent in the right-hand direction and the same finishing process as that for the former horizontal surface is applied to the other horizontal surface of the stair tread (4,5,6,7), which can be an upper surface when the stair tread (4,5,6,7) is inverted to be arranged in the curved portion (10) bent in the left-hand direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/02 (2006.01); E04F 11/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/02 (2013.01); E04F 11/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1122379 A2 20010808; EP 1122379 A3 20021113; EP 1122379 B1 20070411; DK 1122379 T3 20070430; JP 2001220874 A 20010817; JP 3294836 B2 20020624; NO 20010630 A 20010808; NO 20010630 D0 20010206; NO 319433 B1 20050815

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080208

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080207

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-09-29 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-04-30 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2007-04-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FI SE

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DK FI SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI