Global Patent Index - EP 1123316 A4

EP 1123316 A4 2007-10-17 - PROTEIN ENGINEERING

Title (en)

PROTEIN ENGINEERING

Title (de)

PROTEINVERÄNDERUNG

Title (fr)

INGENIERIE DES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1123316 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99970666 A

Priority

  • AU 9900914 W
  • AU PP660698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0023474A1] A method of protein engineering is provided wherein a searchable computer database is created comprising entries in the form of descriptions of a location and orientation in 3D space of side chains of the constituent amino acid residues of a framework protein. A query is created which corresponds to a description of a location and orientation in 3D space of respective side chains of amino acid residues of a sample protein. The location and orientation in 3D space of constituent side-chains is preferably described as a C alpha -C beta vector. The query is used to search the database and thereby identify a hit which corresponds to a framework protein having structural similarity with said sample protein. Framework protein "hits" so identified may be suitable candidates for further modification. A particular advantage of the present invention is that a modified framework protein may display one or more desired characteristics, such as a function similar to or inhibitory of the sample protein.

[origin: WO0023474A1] A method of protein engineering is provided wherein a searchable computer database is created comprising entries in the form of descriptions of a location and orientation in 3D space of side chains of the constituent amino acid residues of a framework protein. A query is created which corresponds to a description of a location and orientation in 3D space of respective side chains of amino acid residues of a sample protein. The location and orientation in 3D space of constituent side-chains is preferably described as a C alpha -C beta vector. The query is used to search the database and thereby identify a hit which corresponds to a framework protein having structural similarity with said sample protein. Framework protein "hits" so identified may be suitable candidates for further modification. A particular advantage of the present invention is that a modified framework protein may display one or more desired characteristics, such as a function similar to or inhibitory of the sample protein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C07K 1/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/535 (2006.01); C07K 14/54 (2006.01); C07K 14/61 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 19/28 (2011.01); G06F 19/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/28 (2013.01); G06F 19/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] LAURI G ET AL: "CAVEAT: A PROGRAM TO FACILITATE THE DESIGN OF ORGANIC MOLECULES", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN, ESCOM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX, vol. 8, no. 1, February 1994 (1994-02-01), pages 51 - 66, XP009082997, ISSN: 0920-654X
  • [A] BOURNE G T ET AL: "142 BETA-TURN NOMENCLATURE: A TOPOGRAPHICAL CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM", 18 June 1995, PEPTIDES: CHEMISTRY, STRUCTURE, BIOLOGY, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 354-355, XP009083002
  • See also references of WO 0023474A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0023474 A1 20000427; AT 500561 T 20110315; AU PP660698 D0 19981112; CA 2347917 A1 20000427; DE 69943242 D1 20110414; EP 1123316 A1 20010816; EP 1123316 A4 20071017; EP 1123316 B1 20110302; JP 2002527845 A 20020827; JP 4633930 B2 20110223; US 2007016380 A1 20070118; US 7092825 B1 20060815

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-03-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69943242

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-02-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2012-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111205

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-07-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110603

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110613

2011-07-06 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-04-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69943242

- Effective date: 20110414

2011-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69943242 P 20110414

2011-03-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2011-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-02-01 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69943242

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C07K0014610000

- IPC: G06F0019000000

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080304

2007-10-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070917

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 19/00 20060101AFI20070515BHEP

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI