Global Patent Index - EP 1123864 A3

EP 1123864 A3 2002-11-06 - Method for making sails

Title (en)

Method for making sails

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Segel

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication de voiles

Publication

EP 1123864 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01103053 A

Priority

DE 10006100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1123864A2] The sail, in particular, for sailing vessels is made up of a plurality of individual panels (3) of canvas whose main fiber direction (5) is oriented along the middle axis (A) of the panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 9/0657 (2013.01); B63H 2009/0678 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20011626 U1 20010517; DE 10006100 A1 20010823; DE 10006100 B4 20051229; EP 1123864 A2 20010816; EP 1123864 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030826

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030405

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI