Global Patent Index - EP 1123894 A8

EP 1123894 A8 2001-12-12 - Load handling apparatus

Title (en)

Load handling apparatus

Title (de)

Ladevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Chargeur

Publication

EP 1123894 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 01101550 A

Priority

  • GB 0002154 A
  • GB 0021217 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1123894A2] A working apparatus (10) includes a body (11), a power operated motive means(14), a front axle (46) and a rear axle (47), the axles (46,47) each carrying ground engaging means (16,17) on which the apparatus (10) may move over the ground, the apparatus (10) further including an operator's cab (25) mounted on the body (18), and there being at least one working arm (18) supported at or adjacent one end (19) on the body (11) at a position for movement relative to the body (11), the arm (18) being adapted to carry a working implement (22,23) at or adjacent a second end (26) thereof, and wherein one of the front (46) and rear (47) axles is suspended from the body (11) by suspension means which is adjustable independently of the other axle (47) to raise the body (11) to a fully raised position in which a plane (P) in which an uppermost part (34) of the body (11) lies, is at a maximum height above the ground and a fully lowered position in which the plane (P) is at a minimum height above the ground. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/065; B60G 17/015

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60G 17/005 (2006.01); B60G 17/016 (2006.01); B60G 21/10 (2006.01); B62D 49/08 (2006.01); B66F 9/065 (2006.01); E02F 3/28 (2006.01); E02F 9/02 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/286 (2013.01); B60G 17/005 (2013.01); B60G 17/016 (2013.01); B60G 21/103 (2013.01); B62D 49/08 (2013.01); B66F 9/0655 (2013.01); E02F 9/024 (2013.01); E02F 9/2217 (2013.01); B60G 2200/314 (2013.01); B60G 2200/32 (2013.01); B60G 2204/46 (2013.01); B60G 2204/4605 (2013.01); B60G 2204/81 (2013.01); B60G 2204/8304 (2013.01); B60G 2300/022 (2013.01); B60G 2300/06 (2013.01); B60G 2300/09 (2013.01); B60G 2400/05 (2013.01); B60G 2800/014 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1123894 A2 20010816; EP 1123894 A3 20011107; EP 1123894 A8 20011212; EP 1123894 B1 20140924; CA 2333487 A1 20010801; CA 2333487 C 20080318; DE 60128599 D1 20070705; DE 60128599 T2 20070913; ES 2285298 T3 20071116; GB 0317781 D0 20030903; GB 0317785 D0 20030903; GB 2387821 A 20031029; GB 2387821 B 20040324; GB 2387822 A 20031029; GB 2387822 B 20040324; US 2001024021 A1 20010927; US 6752403 B2 20040622

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170124

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170125

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60149021

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150625

2015-06-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60149021

2015-01-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2015-01-09 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2526339 T3

- Effective date: 20150109

2014-11-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60149021

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2014-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2014-05-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-04-30 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140401

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACKSON, PHILLIP

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIMPSON, DOMINIC FRANCIS MARTEN

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ALLEN, WALTER ROY

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARSWELL, IAN HAROLD

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOOTHROYD, TIMOTHY

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOWETT, PETER

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACKSON, PHILLIP

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIMPSON, DOMINIC FRANCIS MARTEN

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ALLEN, WALTER ROY

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARSWELLL, IAN HAROLD

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOOTHROYD, TIMOTHY

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOWETT, PETER

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI