Global Patent Index - EP 1124244 A3

EP 1124244 A3 2001-12-19 - Rotary operating mechanism for switchgear

Title (en)

Rotary operating mechanism for switchgear

Title (de)

Drehbetätigungsmechanismus für Schaltvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande rotatif pour appareillage de commutation

Publication

EP 1124244 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01102773 A

Priority

  • JP 2000132222 A
  • JP 2000033892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1124244A2] A rotary mechanism for operating switchgear has a fixed core, a rotary core rotatable within a rotation range limited by end positions corresponding to switchgear open and closed positions, a spring unit for accumulating resilience when the rotary core is rotated to any one of the end positions, a permanent magnet for generating attraction greater than the resilience of the spring unit, to hold the rotary core at any one of the end positions, and an electromagnetic coil for forming, when the rotary core is at one of the end positions, a magnetic path to weaken the attraction of the permanent magnet lower than the resilience of the spring unit so that the rotary core may be rotated to the other end position where the permanent magnet and electromagnetic coil form magnetic paths oriented in the same direction. This rotary operating mechanism has a wide application range, a bistable characteristics, a permanent magnet attraction switching function, and a long switching stroke. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22; H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01H 33/40 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6662 (2013.01); H01H 51/2263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1124244 A2 20010816; EP 1124244 A3 20011219; EP 1124244 B1 20081119; CN 1258789 C 20060607; CN 1312568 A 20010912; DE 60136580 D1 20090102; JP 2001297912 A 20011026; JP 4223657 B2 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60136580

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136580 P 20090102

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI