Global Patent Index - EP 1124738 B1

EP 1124738 B1 2003-06-18 - VALVE FOR RELEASING PRESSURISED LIQUIDS

Title (en)

VALVE FOR RELEASING PRESSURISED LIQUIDS

Title (de)

VENTIL FÜR DIE ABGABE VON UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

VALVE POUR LA DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDES SOUS PRESSION

Publication

EP 1124738 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99971390 A

Priority

  • DE 19850146 A
  • EP 9908197 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19850146A1] The invention relates to a valve for releasing pressurised liquids, foams, gels or similar, comprising a valve body (15) which can be fixed in a liquid-tight manner on the edge of a lid opening configured in a lid for a container opening, a small release tube (13) which is mounted in said valve body (15) in such a way that it is axially displaceable (15), and which can be moved out of a closing position against the force of an elastic element, especially a helical pressure spring (21), and a ring seal (20) consisting of rubber or a similar elastic sealing material, which is located between the edge of the lid opening and the valve body (15) in such a way as to tightly encompass the release tube (13). In the closing position of the release tube (13) or valve, the ring seal closes a discharge channel (25) that is formed in the release tube (13) in a fluid-tight manner, the release tube (13) comprising an annular flange (27) with an annular projection (28) facing towards the ring seal (20), for producing a fluid seal between the ring seal (20) and the discharge channel (25) of the release tube (13). The fluid connection to the discharge channel (25) of the release tube (13) is formed by a passage (24) that is configured in the release tube (13) and which opens into the discharge channel (25) at the end of the same inside the container, the outer edge (29) of the passage (24) being truncated, especially rounded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850146 A1 20000511; AU 1156700 A 20000522; EP 1124738 A1 20010822; EP 1124738 B1 20030618; ES 2203251 T3 20040401; US 6375049 B1 20020423; WO 0026116 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091029

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110308

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2011-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110309

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20100126

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203251 T3

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906037 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI