Global Patent Index - EP 1125238 A4

EP 1125238 A4 2001-12-19 - FINANCIAL INSTRUMENT FILTERING SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREFOR

Title (en)

FINANCIAL INSTRUMENT FILTERING SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREFOR

Title (de)

FINANZIELLES INSTRUMENTENFILTERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FILTRAGE D'INSTRUMENT FINANCIER ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1125238 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99968732 A

Priority

  • US 9920290 W
  • US 9927298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0014670A1] A user interactive apparatus (40) for searching a universe of financial instruments such as stocks, bonds, funds and the like. The search is conducted with a filtering process that involves performing n filter passes of the universe with a computer system having a viewing screen, an input device and an investment selection program. The filter condition for each filter is from a plurality of parameter limiters and a plurality of investment parameters. The pluralities of criteria and of parameters are presented in one area of the viewing screen (55). The program enables a user to select the filter condition for the i<th> filter pass from the displayed criteria and parameters by operation of the input device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06G 1/00; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06G 1/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No Search
  • See also references of WO 0014670A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0014670 A1 20000316; WO 0014670 A9 20001123; AU 6026599 A 20000327; CA 2342860 A1 20000316; EP 1125238 A1 20010822; EP 1125238 A4 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060206

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-12-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06G 1/00 A, 7G 06F 17/60 B

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE