Global Patent Index - EP 1125605 A4

EP 1125605 A4 2003-06-18 - PLAYING MACHINE

Title (en)

PLAYING MACHINE

Title (de)

SPIELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE JEU

Publication

EP 1125605 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00954978 A

Priority

  • JP 0005693 W
  • JP 24427999 A
  • JP 24428099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1125605A1] A game machine comprises a display means 3a for displaying on predetermined zones 50L, 50C and 50R a special symbol indicating shifting to a special game state if the variation display stops at a specific state and game-related designs including a production design indicating the probability of shifting to the special game state and comprises a control means for determining the stop result of the variation display and controlling the display of the display means 3a according to the determination. The control means controls the display means 3a to perform production display of producing a scenario from its beginning to the end during the period from the start to the end of the variation display in the predetermined zones 50L, 50C and 50R. Furthermore, the display means performs a suggestion display of relationship between the production design and the probability of shifting to the special game state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 7/02; A63F 3/02; G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/02 (2006.01); A63F 7/02 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3244 (2013.01); A63F 3/00697 (2013.01); A63F 7/02 (2013.01); G07F 17/3227 (2013.01); A63F 7/025 (2013.01); A63F 2300/807 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5913515 A 19990622 - TAKEMOTO TAKATOSHI [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
  • See also references of WO 0115788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1125605 A1 20010822; EP 1125605 A4 20030618; EP 1125605 B1 20071010; AT 375185 T 20071015; AU 6728300 A 20010326; AU 776286 B2 20040902; DE 60036685 D1 20071122; DE 60036685 T2 20080717; WO 0115788 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60036685

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UNIVERSAL ENTERTAINMENT CORP., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ARUZE CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60036685

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036685

- Representative's name: RUMMLER, FELIX, DIPL.-ING.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036685

- Representative's name: FELIX RUMMLER, DE

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-07-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036685 P 20071122

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63F 7/02 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 17/32 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63F 3/02 B

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI